Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Glass, Krebs, McDermott, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified individuals who have personal knowledge of the death of another individual or who have personally discovered a body to provide specified notice of the death within 4 hours to a specified law enforcement officer; prohibiting an individual from burying or disposing of a body except in a specified manner; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 1 year or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both, for violation of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {836680/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {836680/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM