Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Clippinger, Glenn, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly importing, manufacturing, distributing, selling, or offering for sale a counterfeit airbag or a nonfunctional airbag; prohibiting a person from knowingly installing a counterfeit airbag or a nonfunctional airbag in a motor vehicle; prohibiting a person from knowingly selling or installing a device that causes the vehicle diagnostic system to inaccurately indicate that the airbag is functional when a counterfeit airbag, a nonfunctional airbag, or no airbag is installed; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {768775/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Judiciary 26
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {768775/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 58
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-419 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM