Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Drinking Fountains - Use at State and Local Facilities and Facilities Constructed Using State Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Bobo, Carr, Frush, Otto, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each unit of State government and each county and municipality to make good-faith efforts to achieve a goal of ensuring that at least 75% of specified facilities owned by the State, a county, or a municipality have publicly accessible drinking fountains; requiring a person using any State funds to construct a specified facility to provide publicly accessible drinking fountains in the facility; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-133 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM