Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee Theft - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Vallario, Dumais, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barron, Morales, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions establishing liability to a merchant for civil penalties for shoplifting and employee theft.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-52)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448078/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-5)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Delegates Smith, Dumais, and Rey
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (85-52) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {448078/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-5) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Delegates Smith, Dumais, and Rey 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1301 through 3-1308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM