Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer, except under certain circumstances, from discriminating against an individual because of the individual's receipt of a certain written certification for the use of medical cannabis or the individual's positive drug test under certain circumstances; establishing that certain provisions prohibiting employment discrimination do not require an employer to allow certain use of medical cannabis or make certain reasonable accommodations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page