Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Lierman, and Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying provisions of the Assisted Housing Preservation Act to an owner of an assisted project that pays or intends to pay in full as of the maturity date certain mortgage financing; applying certain provisions to an owner of an assisted project on the termination or expiration of a certain State subsidy; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to convene a meeting by December 31, 2018 of for-profit and nonprofit stakeholders to assist in developing a plan to preserve units in affordable housing; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {690416/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Assisted Housing Preservation Act - Assisted Projects, Protected Actions, and Duties of the Department of Housing and Community Development
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-101, 7-101, 7-102, 7-105, 7-105.1, 7-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page