Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - Billing
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott and Smigiel
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to implement specified measures and specified automated health care billing systems; requiring the Department to conduct specified reviews of specified claims; requiring the Department to implement health care claims and audit recovery services; authorizing the Department to contract with a vendor to implement specified technologies based on specified reimbursement models; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM