Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Specialty Care - Prohibition on Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Miele, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, on or before December 1, 2016, to adopt regulations that require the Department to determine the date on which the eligibility of a Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipient ends, require the Department to include specified information on an authorization for specialty care, and prohibit the Department from authorizing specialty care beyond the date on which the eligibility of a Program recipient ends; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM