Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals Under the Age of 65 Years
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, Bromwell, Carey, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Folden, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, C. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Krebs, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Metzgar, Patterson, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, B. Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $5,000 to $10,000 a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified military retirement income for individuals who are under the age of 65 years on the last day of the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals Under the Age of 65 Years
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM