Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration List Maintenance - Reporting (Voter Registration Security Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each local board of elections to report certain information to the State Board of Elections on or before January 15 each year regarding certain voters who are placed into inactive status and certain voters who are removed from the statewide voter registration list; requiring the State Board to compile and summarize the data reported by the local boards in a report and publish the report on the State Board's website on or before February 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration List Maintenance - Reporting (Voter Registration Security Act)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-501, 3-502, 3-503, 3-507 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page