Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Afzali, Anderson, Barnes, Beitzel, Busch, Clagett, Conway, Eckardt, Elliott, Frush, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Jameson, K. Kelly, Krebs, McComas, McIntosh, Myers, Otto, Ready, Rudolph, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stein, Stifler, Stocksdale, and Wood
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue an exceptional milk hauling permit that authorizes an axle configuration of not less than six axles and a front-to-rear centerline axle spacing of not less than 50 feet and specified increased weight limitations; requiring the Administration to enter into an agreement with the Maryland and Virginia Milk Producers Cooperative Association to collect specified data; requiring specified data to be compiled in an annual report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0771
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {580115/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778272/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments {580115/1 Report Adopted 39
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {778272/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-113.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM