Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter and Proctor
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations about any changes that may be made to the procurement process for law enforcement communications technology that may lead to cost savings for the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0916
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM