Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Hill, Korman, Lierman, Shetty, Wilkins, Attar, Boyce, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lafferty, Lehman, Love, Stein, Stewart, and Wells
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the vehicle excise tax credit for the purchase of certain plug-in electric drive vehicles to include the purchase of certain fuel cell electric vehicles; providing for the credit for a plug-in electric drive vehicle and a fuel cell electric vehicle; prohibiting a person from selling hydrogen as a motor fuel in the State if the hydrogen was produced by natural gas reforming; altering the name, membership, and required activities of the Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, July 1, 2026
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Plug–In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700418/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {173724/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (39-92)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Cars Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-26)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve and Stein)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve and Stein)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Beidle and Hershey)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Beidle and Hershey)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {493025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-27)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {493025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Clean Cars Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Cars Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Plug–In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {700418/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {173724/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (39-92) 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Clean Cars Act of 2019
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-26) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {767672/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve and Stein) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve and Stein) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Beidle and Hershey) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Beidle and Hershey) 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Conference Committee Report {493025/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-27) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Conference Committee Report {493025/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Clean Cars Act of 2019
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text - Chapter - Clean Cars Act of 2019
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-125.1, 11-145.1, 13-815 )
(   2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM