Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Cullison, Glass, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, Niemann, Reznik, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owners and operators of specified swimming pools to develop and implement a specified automated external defibrillator program that meets specified requirements; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems jointly to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page