Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Acevero, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Carr, Charkoudian, Charles, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Ivey, M. Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Krimm, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, Wilkins, Williams, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the public-private partnership agreement for the I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership Program to include certain provisions; authorizing certain revenues derived from certain tolls to be distributed to a certain special fund to be budgeted in a certain manner; requiring the Board of Public Works, on or before October 1, 2021, to request a certain determination letter from the Maryland Transportation Authority and the State Department of Transportation; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 12:09 PM