Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, Clippinger, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from threatening to commit, or causing to be committed, a crime of violence that would place others at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if there are specified probable consequences of the threat; establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of the misdemeanor of making a threat of mass violence; requiring a court to order a person convicted under the Act to reimburse specified persons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0988
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {842115/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898176/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Special Order until evening session (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Muse) Rejected (19-20)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 12:01 AM (Senator Muse) Rejected (15-23)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Special Order until 11:15 PM (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {842115/1 Report Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {898176/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Special Order until evening session (Senator Muse) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Muse) Rejected (19-20) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Motion Special Order until 12:01 AM (Senator Muse) Rejected (15-23) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Special Order until 11:15 PM (Senator Muse) Adopted 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM