Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Roadkill Bill of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Platt, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gaines, Gilchrist, Haynes, Hettleman, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Krimm, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, A. Miller, Pendergrass, Reznik, Robinson, Sophocleus, Stein, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration, in consultation with all interested parties, to adopt timely and comprehensive regulations establishing an accessible process for citizens to report to the Administration roadkill on State highways.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - The Roadkill Bill of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - The Roadkill Bill of 2017
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM