Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain health care practitioners who serve as certain preceptors for a certain preceptorship program approved by the Maryland Department of Health for physician assistant students; requiring the Department, on application of a health care practitioner, to issue a tax credit certificate under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to approve applications on a first-come, first-served basis and notify applicants of approval or denial within 45 days after receipt; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page