Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to disaggregate the information in any student discipline data reports by race, ethnicity, gender, disability status, eligibility for free or reduced price meals or an equivalent measure of socioeconomic status, and English language proficiency; requiring that special education data in a certain student discipline data report be disaggregated by race, ethnicity, and gender; and requiring the Department to collect certain data on alternative school discipline practices.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - School Discipline - Guidelines and Data Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {515363/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-21)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - School Discipline - Guidelines and Data Collection
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {515363/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-21) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Text - Chapter - Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM