Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset Provisions
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Frick, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the tax credits subject to legislative review and evaluation under the Tax Credit Evaluation Act; altering the time periods for the continuation and reevaluation of the tax credits designated for evaluation; terminating the biotechnology investment tax credit, new job creating businesses tax credit, and specified tax credits available under the Enterprise Zone Program, the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program, and the One Maryland Program; making conforming changes; applying the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0843
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016, June 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1406, 5-1407, 5-702, 5-707, 5-709, 6-401 through 6-407 )
(   6-116, 6-119 )
(   10-205, 10-702, 10-704.8, 10-714, 10-725, 10-804, 1-303, 1-310, 8-220 )
(   9-103, 9-103.1, 9-230, 9-317 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM