Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in considering a certificate of need application for new comprehensive care facility beds, to apply the bed need projection that was published and in effect at the time the certificate of need was determined to be complete and was docketed; applying the Act to any certificate of need application pending before the Commission on or after January 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page