Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Haynes, and Proctor
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to provide a progress report on the status of the implementation of specified recommendations of the Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System; requiring the Department to report on specified recommendations; requiring the Department to report on the implementation of the Task Force's recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than December 1, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0982
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juveniles - Strip Search - Limitations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {472112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {148977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sanchez, Conaway and McComas)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sanchez, Conaway and McComas)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, Ready and Brochin)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, Ready and Brochin)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {693725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-21)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juveniles - Strip Search - Limitations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {472112/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {148977/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sanchez, Conaway and McComas) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sanchez, Conaway and McComas) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, Ready and Brochin) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, Ready and Brochin) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Conference Committee Report {693725/1 Adopted 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (98-21) 70
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM