Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic Motor Vehicles - Exemption From Emissions Inspections - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Ruth, Acevero, Bhandari, Feldmark, Forbes, Guyton, J. Lewis, Lierman, Shetty, Stein, Stewart, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the exemption from emissions testing requirements for certain historic motor vehicles by limiting the application of the exemption to vehicles that are at least 40 years old.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Historic Motor Vehicles - Exemption From Emissions Inspections - Limitation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
(   13-936, 13-936.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page