Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Ali, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Hayes, R. Lewis, Lierman, Mosby, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore Police Department to submit, beginning in fiscal year 2019 and in each subsequent fiscal year, a report on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly; and requiring the Department to submit a half-year report for fiscal year 2018 on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Police Department - Community Policing Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Police Department - Community Policing Funds
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {924869/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM