Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, B. Robinson, and Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the penalties for the crime of causing abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult in the first or second degree.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-604, 3-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM