Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsored by
Delegates Frank, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Kach, A. Kelly, Krebs, McConkey, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to satisfy a requirement to publish legal notices in a newspaper of general circulation by posting the notices on its Web site; requiring notices posted on a county or municipality Web site to be conspicuously displayed and be easily accessible; requiring a county or municipality that chooses to post notices on the Internet to publish specified advance notice in a newspaper of general circulation in the county or municipality and to offer a specified mail service; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0397
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1136 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM