Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Volunteer Fire Company and Rescue Squads - Member Disability and Death Benefits - Appeals Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Clark, Crosby, M. Fisher, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain members of a volunteer fire company or rescue squad and certain individuals who are denied payment of a certain disability or death benefit by the Board of Trustees of the Maryland State Firemen's Association to appeal the decision to a certain appeals panel; establishing a certain appeals panel; establishing membership of a certain appeals panel; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Volunteer Fire Company and Rescue Squads - Member Disability and Death Benefits - Appeals Process
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-201 through 7-203, 7-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM