Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prosecution of Offenses Related to Practicing Medicine Without a License - Statute of Limitations - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Frank
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a prosecution for an offense under § 14-601 of the Health Occupations Article of practicing, attempting to practice, or offering to practice medicine without a license be instituted within 3 years after the offense was committed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0894
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Reassigned to Judiciary 29
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53A
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM