Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Community Playground
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi and Brooks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $30,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of The Redeemed Christian Church of God, Jesus House, Baltimore for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of a community playground for The Redeemed Christian Church of God, Jesus House, located in Baltimore County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM