Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, McDermott, Mitchell, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing hospitals, related institutions, and specified insurers to establish patient safety early intervention programs; prohibiting the use of specified statements made during specified discussions held in accordance with specified patient safety early intervention programs as evidence of liability or as evidence of an admission against interest in specified actions and proceedings; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Reassigned to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations 29
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-304.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM