Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Guzzone, Barkley, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Gaines, Hubbard, Jones, A. Kelly, Kramer, Luedtke, McHale, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Murphy, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to reimburse specified providers at a rate sufficient to ensure that a specified wage factor is not less than 50% above the State minimum wage rate; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0890
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-111, 16-201.3, 7-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM