Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a ticket issuer, ticket seller, primary ticket sales platform, or secondary ticket exchange to maintain a specified toll-free number and implement a specified refund policy; requiring a refund of a ticket to include a specified amount and specified fees; specifying that a ticket seller may satisfy specified requirements in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0881
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001 through 14-4003, 14-4002 through 14-4005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM