Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class BLX (on-premises) beer, wine, and liquor license for use in a movie theater with average daily receipts from the sale of food that exceed the average daily receipts from the sale of alcoholic beverages; and establishing the hours for sale under the Class BLX movie theater license.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0995
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-1012.1, 26-102, 26-1405, 26-1406, 26-1604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM