Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Official Oaths - Educational Course Requirement (Maryland Oath of Office Affirmation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Dwyer, Boteler, Glass, Impallaria, Kipke, McConkey, McDonough, W. Miller, Norman, Ready, Schuh, Stocksdale, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, before taking the oath of office, an individual elected or appointed to an office take a specified course on the oath of office, the United States Constitution's Bill of Rights, and the Maryland Declaration of Rights that is offered by an institute of higher education or a specified nonprofit organization; and requiring that the course include 6 hours of instruction and specified content and materials, and use, under specified circumstances, the 1828 Edition of Webster's Dictionary when defining terms.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM