Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Szeliga, Arikan, Chisholm, Cox, Grammer, Hornberger, Malone, Mangione, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, in Harford County, a person to, without a permit, carry a handgun on the property of a church during certain events, with advance notice to the Harford County Sheriff, and transport a handgun to and from certain church events if the person has the written consent of a certain church to carry a handgun on the property during certain events and has the intent to wear, carry, or transport a handgun for certain purposes on the property of the church; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0769 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:27 PM