Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Legal Education Success Collaborative for the purpose of developing methods of increasing diversity in the legal field; requiring institutions to develop and administer programs and cooperatives related to the Collaborative; beginning in fiscal year 2023, requiring appropriations to be made each year to certain institutions and programs and to support a certain coordinator position; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/25/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
(   15-126 )
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page