Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, Gutierrez, Beidle, Bobo, Cane, Carr, Elliott, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hucker, Kach, A. Kelly, Krebs, Lee, McMillan, Mizeur, O'Donnell, Parrott, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland; specifying the composition, powers, and duties of the Task Force; providing for the staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations, including suggested constitutional and legislative changes, to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0240
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0775 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM