Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Healey, Hixson, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Pendergrass, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Summers, F. Turner, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system of public financing of campaigns for candidates for Governor and Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, Comptroller, and the General Assembly; establishing the Public Financing Administration Board and providing for the composition, terms, chair, and other matters concerning the Board; establishing the powers and duties of the Board; establishing a Public Campaign Financing Fund; providing for the contents and administration of the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/07/2014 Text - First - Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-235, 15-101 through 15-111, 15-101 through 15-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM