Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Angel, B. Barnes, Frick, Gutierrez, Luedtke, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified persons or the Commission on Civil Rights to elect to have the claims asserted in a complaint alleging discrimination by a place of public accommodation determined in a civil action brought by the Commission; expanding the remedies available for specified discrimination; clarifying the remedies available for an unlawful employment practice; authorizing a complainant alleging specified discrimination to bring a civil action under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0223
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0285 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001, 20-1006, 20-1007, 20-1009, 20-1012, 20-1013, 20-1016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM