Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing, as a condition of licensure, that tobacco products be prohibited from being sold in specified hospitals, related institutions, and nursing homes; requiring that specified regulations prohibit the sale of tobacco products in specified freestanding medical facilities and hospice facilities; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations that prohibit the sale of tobacco products in specified freestanding ambulatory care facilities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1401.2, 19-319, 19-3A-02, 19-3B-03, 19-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM