Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Adams, Brooks, Clippinger, Fennell, Frick, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, and Mosby
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified fees and charges permitted to be imposed on a consumer borrower under an unsecured open end credit plan, when combined with any interest charged under the plan, may not exceed an effective rate of 33% per annum simple interest; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Text - Chapter - Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and Charges
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM