Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or Likeness
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified individual whose name or likeness has commercial value and is used for a commercial or advertising purpose without the written consent of the individual or the written consent of a specified party to bring an action to enjoin the unauthorized use and to recover damages for loss or injury sustained by the use; authorizing specified individuals or persons to bring a specified action; prohibiting an action under the Act from being commenced after a specified period; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0557 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1901 through 3-1904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM