Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Injury From Lead-Based Paint - Application of Notice Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a specified notice requirement under the Local Government Tort Claims Act does not apply to a claim of injury from exposure to lead-based paint occurring on or after January 1, 1988.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0987
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters and Judiciary
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM