Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, McIntosh, Cullison, K. Young, Pena-Melnyk, R. Lewis, Charles, Kelly, Rosenberg, Barron, Johnson, and Hill
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from accepting any federal funding under Title X of the federal Public Health Service Act if the Title X program excludes family planning providers and does not require certain providers to provide a broad range of acceptable and effective medically approved family planning methods and services; requiring the Governor to fund the Family Planning Program with State funds at the same level of total funds as the preceding fiscal year if the Department does not accept Title X program funds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0904
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {316082/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {573827/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-16)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {316082/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {573827/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-28) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (28-16) 60
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3401, 13-3402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM