Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Lee, Rosenberg, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from distributing, selling, furnishing, or giving away or offering to sell, furnish, or give away an energy drink to a minor; establishing a specified defense for a prosecution for a specified violation; prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell an energy drink in a vending machine or any other automatic device; prohibiting a person from providing free samples of energy drinks or coupons for free or discounted energy drinks to minors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0986
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-136 through 10-140 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM