Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to enact a law that establishes a specified land bank authority; requiring an ordinance establishing the Authority to include specified articles of incorporation; requiring specified articles of incorporation to be filed, accepted, and amended in a specified manner; authorizing Prince George's County to take specified actions by law; providing for the disposition of property and obligation of the Authority on termination; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-601 through 9-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM