Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Acevero, Bridges, Glenn, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Ivey, Lehman, J. Lewis, Luedtke, Moon, Terrasa, Turner, Wells, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an administrative law judge to complete a training course on special education law before conducting a mediation session or due process hearing related to special education on or after August 1, 2020; establishing certain criteria for a certain training course; prohibiting an administrative law judge from conducting a certain mediation session or due process hearing under certain circumstances; requiring the Office of Administrative Hearings to convene a certain committee for a certain purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM