Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, A. Washington, and Ali
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to conduct an audit of the accuracy of the voting system's tabulation of votes by completing a certain audit of electronic ballot images and a certain manual audit after each statewide general election; requiring the State Board to complete a certain audit of electronic ballot images after each statewide primary election; requiring the State Board to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly by May 1, 2019, describing the resources required to complete the audit; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {955868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754038/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audit
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {955868/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audit
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {754038/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
(   11-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page