Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review to be the Regulatory Oversight Committee; requiring the Division of State Documents to make available to the public direct online searching of specified public comments received by a promulgating unit during a specified comment period; requiring a unit to submit to the Governor a copy of a proposed emergency regulation and a specific description of the grounds requiring the emergency adoption; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-501, 3-505, 3-506 )
(   9-289 )
(   5.5-108, 5-314 )
(   4-1009, 4-1009.1, 4-1103, 8-1806, 8-1810 )
(   12-204, 14-304 )
(   10-101, 10-107, 10-111, 10-130, 10-803, 2-1505.2, 2-501, 2-502, 7-201, 7-206.2, 9.5-309 )
(   2-103.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page