Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Enrollees in the Employed Individuals with Disabilities Program – Demonstration Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a demonstration program supported by State general funds to cover health care services provided to certain individuals that are not covered by the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; authorizing the Department to establish eligibility criteria for and a cap on enrollment in the demonstration program; requiring the Department by December 1, 2020, to submit to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly a certain report on the demonstration program; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0660
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966887/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver Amendment
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {966887/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health – Enrollees in the Employed Individuals with Disabilities Program – Demonstration Program
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health – Enrollees in the Employed Individuals with Disabilities Program – Demonstration Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM